This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 07:02:28 (UTC).

Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company vs Collins

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Collins. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company

Defendant

Collins, Tom

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schoeck, Michael D

Attorney at SIEGEL MORENO & STETTLER APC

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint (Amendments)

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company.

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCases consolidated on 01/21/2021. 37-2020-00030668-CU-PA-CTL is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom Filed By: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Filed By: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Filed By: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom Filed By: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom Filed By: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom Filed By: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company. Refers to: Collins, Tom Filed By: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc for Falls Lake Fire and Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D