This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:58:45 (UTC).

Scottsdale Insurance Company vs Starvest LP

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 Scottsdale Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Starvest LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VUCKOVICH, MILORAD

YANCEY, DAVID W

STARVEST LP

VUCKOVICH, LJILJANA

VUCKOVICH, KATARINA

SUNRISE MANAGEMENT INC

SAN DIEGO SUNRISE MANAGEMENT COMPANY; ESA : SUNRISE MANAGEMENT INC

GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

SAN DIEGO SUNRISE MANAGEMENT COMPANY; ESA : SUNRISE MANAGEMENT INC

COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY

IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

THE BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY

Evanston Insurance Company

Guardian Ad Litem

KRASOVEC, SANDY

Intervenor

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RAMOS, LAURA R

11766 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90025

ROJAS, VALERIE D

Attorney at SEDGWIK LLP

801 S Figueroa Street 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAFAVE, JEFFREY F

Attorney at LAFAVE & RICE

201 1St Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

CRUMP, WALTER G.

1388 Sutter St

San Francisco, CA 94109

JOHNSON, KAITLYN G.

Attorney at KORNBLUM COCHRAN ERICKSON% HARBISON LLP

1388 Sutter St

San Francisco, CA 94109

KORNBLUM, GUY O.

1388 Sutter St

San Francisco, CA 94109

CAPLAN, RYAN C

MILLER, CECILIA O'CONNELL

525 B St

San Diego, CA 92101

SMELKO, WILLIAM A

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

WOLKIN, BRANDT L

THOMAS, AMY K

ROJAS, VALERIE D

Attorney at SEDGWIK LLP

801 S Figueroa Street 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LANDEN, ROBERT K

7647 N Fresno St

Fresno, CA 93720

AGNES, AARON C

Khanjian, Lilian M

Attorney at LOCKE LORD LLP

Intervenor Attorney

NALTSAS, CATHERINE A.

Attorney at LYNBERG & WATKINS A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1150 S Olive Street Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90015

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing (Continuance on Motion to Strike) filed by The Burlington Insurance Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Yancey, David W; Starvest LP.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.

Complaint in Intervention

Complaint in Intervention filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. Refers to: Scottsdale Insurance Company

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation Regarding First Amended Complaint Filed By National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Yancey, David W; Yancey, David W; Yancey, David W; Starvest LP; Starvest LP; Starvest LP.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..

Answer

Answer filed by San Diego Sunrise Management Company.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/16/2017 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Answer Of Cross-defendant Gemini Insurance Company To San Diego Sunrise Management Companys Fourth Amended Cross complaint

Answer filed by Gemini Insurance Company.

Reply

Reply filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion

Statement - Other (Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion) filed by Yancey, David W; Starvest LP.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY.

Declaration of Michael Earl in Support of Motion

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Michael Earl in Support of Motion) filed by Yancey, David W; Starvest LP.

Declaration of David Yancey in Support of Motion

Declaration - Other (Declaration of David Yancey in Support of Motion) filed by Yancey, David W; Starvest LP.

212 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Evanston Insurance Company. Filed By: Evanston Insurance Company (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Returned Mail (re Notice of rescheduled heairng, status conference for Atty Brian W. Walsh; P.O. label, Return to sender, attempted-not known, unable to forward) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: WALSH, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (Status Conference Report) filed by San Diego Sunrise Management Company. Filed By: San Diego Sunrise Management Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement - Other (Status Conference Report) filed by San Diego Sunrise Management Company. Filed By: San Diego Sunrise Management Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/14/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Status Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 08/16/2019 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Returned Mail (re notice of hearing; osc why case should not be dismissed for Atty Brian W. Walsh) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: WALSH, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Evanston Insurance Company. Filed By: Evanston Insurance Company (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Yancey, David W; Starvest LP. Filed By: Yancey, David W (Defendant); Starvest LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
292 More Docket Entries
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by San Diego Sunrise Management Company. Refers to: The Burlington Insurance Company; COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY; Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company; Scottsdale Insurance Company Filed By: San Diego Sunrise Management Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Filing Proofs of Service and Complaint) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Filed By: Scottsdale Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Filed By: Scottsdale Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/24/2016 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Refers to: Starvest LP; Yancey, David; San Diego Sunrise Management Company; Vuckovich, Milorad; Vuckovich, Ljiljana; Vuckovich, Katarina; Krasovec, Sandy Filed By: Scottsdale Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Refers to: Starvest LP; Yancey, David; San Diego Sunrise Management Company; Vuckovich, Milorad; Vuckovich, Ljiljana; Vuckovich, Katarina; Krasovec, Sandy Filed By: Scottsdale Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Refers to: Starvest LP; Yancey, David; San Diego Sunrise Management Company; Vuckovich, Milorad; Vuckovich, Ljiljana; Vuckovich, Katarina; Krasovec, Sandy Filed By: Scottsdale Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.