This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/16/2018 at 06:12:47 (UTC).

Douglas vs. Edwards

Case Summary

On 03/23/2011 Douglas filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Edwards. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Others, Appellants and Cross Defendants

DOUGLAS, SCOTT

DOUGLAS, LISA

KATHLEEN R DOUGLAS AS TRUSTEE OF THE KATHLEEN R DOUGLAS 2004 TRUST

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Defendant / Cross Appellants and Respondents

EDWARDS, WHITNEY

PROVIDENT FUNDING

CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY

NEW CENTURY TITLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Other, Appellant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STEINKE, KRISTEN

Attorney at RAUCH DETISCH & STEINKE A PROFESSIONAL LAW

1010 Second Avenue Ste 1770

San Diego, CA 92101

RAUCH, ANDREW K

Attorney at ANDREW RAUCH APC

110 West C Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Defendant / Cross Appellant and Respondent Attorneys

KESSLER, DANIEL J

Attorney at KESSLER & SEECOF LLP

3990 Old Town Avenue Suite B 109

San Diego, CA 92110

SEECOF, BENJAMIN R

Attorney at KESSLER & SEECOF LLP

3990 Old Town Avenue Suite B 109

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR ALTERNATIVELY NONSUIT OR DISMISSAL TO KESSLER & SEECOF LLP AND PITE DUNCAN LLP) filed by Douglas, Lisa; Douglas, Scott; Kathleen R Douglas as Trustee of the Kathleen R Douglas 2004 Trust.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/20/2016 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (3RD) filed by Douglas, Scott; Douglas, Lisa; Kathleen R Douglas as Trustee of the Kathleen R Douglas 2004 Trust. Refers to: Edwards, Whitney; Provident Funding; California Reconveyance Company; New Century Title

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (SERVED 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Douglas, Scott; Douglas, Lisa; Kathleen R Douglas as Trustee of the Kathleen R Douglas 2004 Trust.

Original Summons

Original Summons (3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT BY K DOUGLAS AS TRUSTEE, SCOTT AND LISA DOUGLAS- ISSUED 6.25.2016) filed by Douglas, Lisa; Douglas, Scott; Kathleen R Douglas as Trustee of the Kathleen R Douglas 2004 Trust.

Demurrer

Demurrer filed by Edwards, Whitney.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 08/12/2016 09:00:00 AM.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Paula Rahn) filed by Douglas, Scott.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 10/14/2016 10:45:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 09/30/2016 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/31/2016 09:00:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 506)

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/31/2016 09:00:00 AM. (As Amended)

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/22/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/30/2017 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (STIPULATION REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER THEREON) submitted by Kathleen R Douglas as Trustee of the Kathleen R Douglas 2004 Trust; Douglas, Lisa; Douglas, Scott rejected on 03/22/2017.

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 3 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 2 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 1 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 6 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 5 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 4 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 10 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 9 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 8 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 3/15/18 - Volume 7 of 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
496 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/07/2011 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketThe ex parte application for approval of notice of pendency of action was granted without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for Court Approval of Notice of Pendency of Action) filed by Douglas, Scott. Refers to: Edwards, Whitney; Provident Funding Associates, L.P.; Reconveyance Company, A California corporation, successor in interest to New Century Title Filed By: Douglas, Scott (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 04/07/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action submitted by Douglas, Scott rejected on 03/24/2011. Filed By: Douglas, Scott (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Douglas, Scott; Douglas, Lisa; Douglas, Kathleen. Refers to: Edwards, Whitney; Provident Funding Associates, L.P.; Reconveyance Company, A California corporation, successor in interest to New Century Title Filed By: Douglas, Scott (Plaintiff); Douglas, Lisa (Plaintiff); Douglas, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Douglas, Scott; Douglas, Lisa; Douglas, Kathleen. Refers to: Edwards, Whitney; Provident Funding Associates, L.P.; Reconveyance Company, A California corporation, successor in interest to New Century Title Filed By: Douglas, Scott (Plaintiff); Douglas, Lisa (Plaintiff); Douglas, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed by Douglas, Scott; Douglas, Lisa; Douglas, Kathleen. Refers to: Edwards, Whitney; Provident Funding Associates, L.P.; Reconveyance Company, A California corporation, successor in interest to New Century Title Filed By: Douglas, Scott (Plaintiff); Douglas, Lisa (Plaintiff); Douglas, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Reconveyance Company Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINKE, KRISTEN S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rauch, Andrew K