This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 08:50:03 (UTC).

Schrager vs California Coastal Commission

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Schrager filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California Coastal Commission. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Casserly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************M-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy M. Casserly

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013

ROBERT E. DESIMONE trustee of the DeSimone Family Trust dated February 9, 1993

Schrager, Richard A

Oene, Mark Van

RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017

DeSimone, Robert E

Respondent

California Coastal Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Aannestad, Anders T

Attorney at AANNESTAD ANDELIN & CORN LLP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oene, Mark Van; MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013; Schrager, Richard A; RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017; DeSimone, Robert E; ROBERT E. DESIMONE trustee of the DeSimone Family Trust dated February 9, 1993. Refers to: California Coastal Commission

Request for Preparation of Administrative Record

Declaration - Other (REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD) filed by Oene, Mark Van; MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013; Schrager, Richard A; RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017; DeSimone, Robert E; ROBERT E. DESIMONE trustee of the DeSimone Family Trust dated February 9, 1993.

Petition for Writ of Mandate

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Schrager, Richard A; Oene, Mark Van; DeSimone, Robert E; RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017; MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013; ROBERT E. DESIMONE trustee of the DeSimone Family Trust dated February 9, 1993. Refers to: California Coastal Commission

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schrager, Richard A; Oene, Mark Van; DeSimone, Robert E. Refers to: California Coastal Commission

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Schrager, Richard A; Oene, Mark Van; DeSimone, Robert E. Refers to: California Coastal Commission

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD) filed by Oene, Mark Van; MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013; Schrager, Richard A; RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017; DeSimone, Robert E; ROBERT E. DESIMONE trustee of the DeSimone Family Trust dated February 9, 1993. Filed By: Oene, Mark Van (Petitioner); MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013 (Petitioner); Schrager, Richard A (Petitioner); RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017 (Petitioner); DeSimone, Robert E (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oene, Mark Van; MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013; Schrager, Richard A; RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017; DeSimone, Robert E; ROBERT E. DESIMONE trustee of the DeSimone Family Trust dated February 9, 1993. Refers to: California Coastal Commission Filed By: Oene, Mark Van (Petitioner); MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013 (Petitioner); Schrager, Richard A (Petitioner); RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017 (Petitioner); DeSimone, Robert E (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by Schrager, Richard A; Oene, Mark Van; DeSimone, Robert E; RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017; MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013; ROBERT E. DESIMONE trustee of the DeSimone Family Trust dated February 9, 1993. Refers to: California Coastal Commission Filed By: Schrager, Richard A (Petitioner); Oene, Mark Van (Petitioner); DeSimone, Robert E (Petitioner); RICHARD A. SCHRAGER trustee of the Schrager Community Property Funnel Trust dated August 16, 2017 (Petitioner); MARK VAN OENE trustee of the Van Oene-Spooner Family Trust dated November 19, 2013 (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schrager, Richard A; Oene, Mark Van; DeSimone, Robert E. Refers to: California Coastal Commission Filed By: Schrager, Richard A (Petitioner); Oene, Mark Van (Petitioner); DeSimone, Robert E (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Schrager, Richard A; Oene, Mark Van; DeSimone, Robert E. Refers to: California Coastal Commission Filed By: Schrager, Richard A (Petitioner); Oene, Mark Van (Petitioner); DeSimone, Robert E (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA COASTALCOMMISSION is a litigant