This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 06:21:28 (UTC).

Scholer vs Collins

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Scholer filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Collins. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hoffman, Joshua

Scholer, Elijah

Villalvazo, Joshua

Defendants

Collins, Jayna Francine

Collins, Robin

Collins, Jayna F

Collins, Robin A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nazarian, Joseph J

Defendant Attorney

Cooper, Benjamin P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Scholer, Elijah; Villalvazo, Joshua; Hoffman, Joshua. Refers to: Collins, Jayna; Collins, Robin

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Scholer, Elijah; Villalvazo, Joshua; Hoffman, Joshua. Refers to: Collins, Jayna; Collins, Robin

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Scholer, Elijah; Villalvazo, Joshua; Hoffman, Joshua. Refers to: Collins, Jayna; Collins, Robin

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Notice to Litigants SD

Notice to Litigants SD generated.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Scholer, Elijah; Hoffman, Joshua; Villalvazo, Joshua.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Scholer, Elijah; Hoffman, Joshua; Villalvazo, Joshua.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (as to Robin Collins ONLY) filed by Scholer, Elijah; Hoffman, Joshua; Villalvazo, Joshua. Refers to: Collins, Robin; Collins, Jayna

Answer

Answer filed by Collins, Jayna F; Collins, Robin A.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Collins, Jayna F; Collins, Robin A.; Filed By: Collins, Jayna F (Defendant); Collins, Robin A (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by Scholer, Elijah; Villalvazo, Joshua; Hoffman, Joshua was entered as to Collins, Robin on Complaint . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (as to Robin Collins ONLY) filed by Scholer, Elijah; Hoffman, Joshua; Villalvazo, Joshua. Refers to: Collins, Robin; Collins, Jayna; Filed By: Scholer, Elijah (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Joshua (Plaintiff); Villalvazo, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Scholer, Elijah; Hoffman, Joshua; Villalvazo, Joshua.; Filed By: Scholer, Elijah (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Joshua (Plaintiff); Villalvazo, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Scholer, Elijah; Hoffman, Joshua; Villalvazo, Joshua.; Filed By: Scholer, Elijah (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Joshua (Plaintiff); Villalvazo, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Litigants SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Scholer, Elijah; Villalvazo, Joshua; Hoffman, Joshua. Refers to: Collins, Jayna; Collins, Robin; Filed By: Scholer, Elijah (Plaintiff); Villalvazo, Joshua (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Scholer, Elijah; Villalvazo, Joshua; Hoffman, Joshua. Refers to: Collins, Jayna; Collins, Robin; Filed By: Scholer, Elijah (Plaintiff); Villalvazo, Joshua (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Scholer, Elijah; Villalvazo, Joshua; Hoffman, Joshua. Refers to: Collins, Jayna; Collins, Robin; Collins, Robin; Collins, Jayna; Filed By: Scholer, Elijah (Plaintiff); Villalvazo, Joshua (Plaintiff); Hoffman, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less