This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 23:16:56 (UTC).

Schaures vs Patterson Dental

Case Summary

On 01/03/2017 Schaures filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Patterson Dental. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHAURES, MENCHIE

Defendant

PATTERSON DENTAL

Cross Plaintiffs

PATTERSON DENTAL SUPPLY INC

CONSOLIDATED CONTRACTING SERVICES INC

Cross Defendants

ARTIMEX IRON COMPANY INC

MIYAMOTO INTERNATIONAL

NTD ARCHITECTS

Intervenor

BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEITZEN, STEVEN B

3588 Fourth Avenue 210

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant Attorney

LEACH, ROB G

2635 Camino Del Rio South Suite 102

San Diego, CA 92108

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PERLMAN, RANDY S

2635 Camino Del Rio South 102

San Diego, CA 92108

ANIELSKI, JEFFREY M

9325 Sky Park Court 230

San Diego, CA 92123

Cross Defendant Attorney

ISAACS, JACKSON

Attorney at ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL LLP

4365 Executive Drive 950

San Diego, CA 92121

Intervenor Attorney

FITZPATRICK, PETER V

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Patterson Dental.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Patterson Dental.

Patterson Dental Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Patterson Dental.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 5) filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Consolidated Contracting Services Inc

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 6) filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Boulder Associates Architects

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 7) filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Rhenberg, Nicholas

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Schaures, Menchie.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/23/2017 01:00:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Naming DOE 9 - NTD Architecture) filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Patterson Dental; Consolidated Contracting Services Inc; Rhenberg, Nicholas; Boulder Associates Architects; NTD Architecture

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Naming DOE 10 - Miyamoto International) filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Patterson Dental; Consolidated Contracting Services Inc; Rhenberg, Nicholas; Boulder Associates Architects; NTD Architecture; Miyamoto International

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Boulder Associates Architects; Rhenberg, Nicholas

Notice of Lien

Notice of Lien filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Patterson Dental; Artimex Iron Company Inc

Motion - Other

Motion - Other (Notice of Motion and Motion to File Complaint-In-Intervention) filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP.

Patterson Dental Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Patterson Dental Supply Inc. Refers to: Miyamoto International; NTD ARCHITECTS

Patterson Dental First Amended Answer

Answer filed by Patterson Dental.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP.

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Counsel filed by Schaures, Menchie. Filed By: Schaures, Menchie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (Second) filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Patterson Dental Filed By: Schaures, Menchie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/16/2018 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition - Other filed by Miyamoto International. Filed By: Miyamoto International (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment filed by Schaures, Menchie. Filed By: Schaures, Menchie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Schaures, Menchie. Filed By: Schaures, Menchie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP. Filed By: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Intervenor)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Consolidated Contracting Services Inc. Filed By: Consolidated Contracting Services Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Patterson Dental. Filed By: Patterson Dental (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Patterson Dental. Filed By: Patterson Dental (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Patterson Dental. Filed By: Patterson Dental (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Patterson Dental Filed By: Schaures, Menchie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Patterson Dental Filed By: Schaures, Menchie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Schaures, Menchie. Refers to: Patterson Dental; Consolidated Contracting Services Inc; Boulder Associates Architects; Rhenberg, Nicholas; NTD Architecture; Miyamoto International Filed By: Schaures, Menchie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSOLIDATED CONTRACTING SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Patterson Dental Supply Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK PETER V.