This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 04:47:34 (UTC).

Save Jacumba vs San Diego County Board of Supervisors

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Save Jacumba filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against San Diego County Board of Supervisors. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Osborne, Jeffrey

Save Jacumba

We Are Human Kind LLC

Respondent

San Diego County Board of Supervisors

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Volker, Stephan Coles

Respondent Attorney

Heinlein, Joshua M

 

Court Documents

PETITIONERS STATEMENT OF ISSUES

Statement - Other (STATEMENT OF ISSUES) filed by Osborne, Jeffrey; Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/19/2021 02:00:00 PM.

Statement - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Statement - Other (JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES) filed by JVR ENERGY PARK LLC.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Osborne, Jeffrey; Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Osborne, Jeffrey; Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC.

Notice of Certification of Administrative Record

Notice - Other (OF CERTIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD) filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD) filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Ronald Frazier effective 10/13/2021

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by JVR ENERGY PARK LLC.

Notice of Settlement Meeting

Notice - Other (OF SETTLEMENT MEETING) filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

Notice of Errata Re Administrative Record

Notice of Errata (RE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD) filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors.

Respondent and Defendant San Diego County Board of Supervisor's Answer to Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Attorneys' Fees

Answer filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors.

Answer

Answer filed by JVR ENERGY PARK LLC.

Real Party in Interest JVR Energy Park LLC and Respondent and Defendant San Diego County Board of Supervisors' Joint Status Conference Statement

Statement - Other (Joint Status Conference Statement) filed by JVR ENERGY PARK LLC.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement - Other (JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES) filed by JVR ENERGY PARK LLC. Filed By: JVR ENERGY PARK LLC (Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/19/2021 02:00:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement - Other (STATEMENT OF ISSUES) filed by Osborne, Jeffrey; Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC. Filed By: Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner); Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement - Other (Joint Status Conference Statement) filed by JVR ENERGY PARK LLC. Filed By: JVR ENERGY PARK LLC (Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by JVR ENERGY PARK LLC. Filed By: JVR ENERGY PARK LLC (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors. Filed By: San Diego County Board of Supervisors (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego County Board of Supervisors. Filed By: San Diego County Board of Supervisors (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other (FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND ATTORNEYS FEES) filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Save Jacumba; We Are Human Kind LLC; Osborne, Jeffrey. Refers to: San Diego County Board of Supervisors; JVR ENERGY PARK LLC Filed By: Save Jacumba (Petitioner); We Are Human Kind LLC (Petitioner); Osborne, Jeffrey (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less