This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 10:09:26 (UTC).

Save Famosa Canyon vs San Diego Housing Commission

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Save Famosa Canyon filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against San Diego Housing Commission. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel R. Wohlfeil and Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ronald F. Frazier

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Save Famosa Canyon

Respondent

San Diego Housing Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DeLano, Everett L III

Attorney at DELANO & DELANO

104 W Grand Ave A

Escondido, CA 92025

Respondent Attorney

Christensen, Charles B

401 W A Street 2250

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/01/2022 11:15:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/20/2022 08:30:00 AM.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (OF ISABELA RODRIGUEZ) filed by Save Famosa Canyon.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time (on writ petition) filed by Save Famosa Canyon.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Wohlfeil, Joel R. to Ronald Frazier effective 05/31/2022

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Objections

Objections filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (by Fax) filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge submitted by San Diego Housing Commission received but not filed on 05/24/2022.

Answer

Answer filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by Save Famosa Canyon.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Save Famosa Canyon.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Save Famosa Canyon.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Hearing on Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/01/2022 11:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition continued pursuant to Court's motion to 03/24/2023 at 01:30PM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/20/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF ISABELA RODRIGUEZ) filed by Save Famosa Canyon.; Filed By: Save Famosa Canyon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Order Shortening Time (on writ petition) filed by Save Famosa Canyon.; Filed By: Save Famosa Canyon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 06/20/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Wohlfeil, Joel R. to Ronald Frazier effective 05/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Save Famosa Canyon.; Filed By: Save Famosa Canyon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Brief filed by Save Famosa Canyon.; Filed By: Save Famosa Canyon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Save Famosa Canyon. Refers to: San Diego Housing Commission; Filed By: Save Famosa Canyon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Save Famosa Canyon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Save Famosa Canyon. Refers to: San Diego Housing Commission; Filed By: Save Famosa Canyon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate (Compel Compliance with Public Records Act; Complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief) filed by Save Famosa Canyon. Refers to: San Diego Housing Commission; Filed By: Save Famosa Canyon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Diego Housing Commission is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DeLano, Everett L III