This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 11:47:15 (UTC).

Sarmiento vs. Valdez Robles

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Sarmiento filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Valdez Robles. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy M. Casserly and Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy M. Casserly

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarmiento, Esmeralda

Defendant

Valdez Robles, Gerardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gabbara, Louis

Defendant Attorney

Gillard, Gerald F

Attorney at CHAVEZ LEGAL GROUP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Refers to: Valdez Robles, Gerardo

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Refers to: Valdez Robles, Gerardo

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Refers to: Valdez Robles, Gerardo

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Valdez Robles, Gerardo.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Valdez Robles, Gerardo. Refers to: Sarmiento, Esmeralda

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/17/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Valdez Robles, Gerardo.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/19/2022 at 10:15AM before Judge Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJury demanded by All parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/17/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Filed By: Sarmiento, Esmeralda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Filed By: Sarmiento, Esmeralda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Filed By: Sarmiento, Esmeralda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Bowman, Blaine for 09/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Refers to: Valdez Robles, Gerardo Filed By: Sarmiento, Esmeralda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Refers to: Valdez Robles, Gerardo Filed By: Sarmiento, Esmeralda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sarmiento, Esmeralda. Refers to: Valdez Robles, Gerardo Filed By: Sarmiento, Esmeralda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILLARD GERALD