This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/06/2020 at 07:03:35 (UTC).

Sarmad Yousif vs. John Kerzic

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Sarmad Yousif filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against John Kerzic. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Yousif, Sarmad

Respondent

Kerzic, John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingLocation: E-21; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order - Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John; Alass, Roua; Goryal, Selsti; Goryal, Seventian; Goryal, Crystal; Goryal, Gabriel Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John; Alass, Roua; Goryal, Selsti; Goryal, Seventian; Goryal, Crystal; Goryal, Gabriel Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Dec of Norma Saucedo) filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John; Alass, Roua; Goryal, Selsti; Goryal, Seventian; Goryal, Crystal; Goryal, Gabriel Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Dec of Robert Wirth) filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John; Alass, Roua; Goryal, Selsti; Goryal, Seventian; Goryal, Crystal; Goryal, Gabriel Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Dec of Jesus Lopez Acosta) filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John; Alass, Roua; Goryal, Selsti; Goryal, Seventian; Goryal, Crystal; Goryal, Gabriel Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Dec of Maria Beltran) filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John; Alass, Roua; Goryal, Selsti; Goryal, Seventian; Goryal, Crystal; Goryal, Gabriel Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Yousif, Sarmad. Refers to: Kerzic, John Filed By: Yousif, Sarmad (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 07/09/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.