This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2018 at 06:59:49 (UTC).

Saraspe vs. LoPreste

Case Summary

On 09/07/2012 Saraspe filed an Other lawsuit against LoPreste. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD S. PRAGER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD S. PRAGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Saraspe, Sarah

FIVE STAR FISH PROCESSING LLC

Defendants

Fishermans Landing Corp

Fishermans Processing Inc

LoPreste, Frank

POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC

Royal Polaris Sportfishing Inc

Royal Star Sportfishing Inc

SHOGUN SPORTFISHING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Toothacre, Scott H

WEINSTEIN, MICHAEL R

Defendant Attorneys

MARTINEZ, JORGE A

DIAZ, CHRISTINE A

POTEPAN, JAMES C

CURTIS, COURTNEY E.

WOOD, CARY L

Frostrom, Karen R

BARTOLOTTA, VINCENT J JR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: LoPreste, Frank; Fishermans Landing Corp; Fishermans Processing Inc; POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC; Royal Polaris Sportfishing Inc; SHOGUN SPORTFISHING INC; Royal Star Sportfishing Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: LoPreste, Frank; Fishermans Landing Corp; Fishermans Processing Inc; POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC; Royal Polaris Sportfishing Inc; SHOGUN SPORTFISHING INC; Royal Star Sportfishing Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: LoPreste, Frank; Fishermans Landing Corp; Fishermans Processing Inc; POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC; Royal Polaris Sportfishing Inc; SHOGUN SPORTFISHING INC; Royal Star Sportfishing Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: LoPreste, Frank

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: SHOGUN SPORTFISHING INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: Fishermans Landing Corp

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: Royal Polaris Sportfishing Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: Royal Star Sportfishing Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: Fishermans Processing Inc

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Saraspe, Sarah.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (point loma sportfishing association of san diego, inc) filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (royal star sportfishing, inc) filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: Royal Star Sportfishing Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (fisherman's landing corp) filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: Fishermans Landing Corp

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (shogun sportfishing, inc) filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: SHOGUN SPORTFISHING INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (frank lopreste) filed by Saraspe, Sarah. Refers to: LoPreste, Frank

Certificate of Progress: Inability to Respond

Certificate of Progress: Inability to Respond (GRANTED TO 11/21/12) filed by LoPreste, Frank.

284 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by LoPreste, Frank; Fishermans Processing Inc. Filed By: LoPreste, Frank (Defendant); Fishermans Processing Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Five Star Fish Processing LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Saraspe, Sarah .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Royal Star Sportfishing Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to SHOGUN SPORTFISHING INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Royal Polaris Sportfishing Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Fishermans Processing Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Fishermans Landing Corp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to LoPreste, Frank .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Fishermans Landing Corp. Filed By: Fishermans Landing Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Re Stipulation and order to continue expert designation and supplemental designation) filed by POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC. Filed By: POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (continue expert designation) filed by POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC. Refers to: Saraspe, Sarah Filed By: POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other filed by POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC; LoPreste, Frank; Fishermans Landing Corp; Royal Polaris Sportfishing Inc; Saraspe, Sarah. Filed By: POINT LOMA SPORTFISHING ASSOCIATION OF SAN DIEGO INC (Defendant); LoPreste, Frank (Defendant); Fishermans Landing Corp (Defendant); Royal Polaris Sportfishing Inc (Defendant); Saraspe, Sarah (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/09/2014 08:15:00 AM. (As Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/09/2014 08:15:00 AM. (As Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/09/2014 08:15:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 222)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/09/2014 08:15:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 221)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less