This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/08/2018 at 09:48:26 (UTC).

Santiago Sevilla vs. Fresh Start Financial Solutions

Case Summary

On 08/13/2009 Santiago Sevilla filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Fresh Start Financial Solutions. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEVILLA, KATHRYN

SEVILLA, SANTIAGO

Defendants

LE-COMPTE, KIWI

FRESH START FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS

LEWIS, ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PASHA, NASIR N

4025 Camino Del Rio S

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute submitted by Sevilla, Kathryn; Sevilla, Santiago rejected on 03/29/2010.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Lewis, Arthur; Le-Compte, Kiwi on Complaint filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn .

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn rejected on 08/27/2010. Refers to: Lewis, Arthur; Le-Compte, Kiwi

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 10/25/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 10/25/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/25/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 12/09/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 12/09/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Lewis, Arthur; Le-Compte, Kiwi on Complaint filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn .

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 07/25/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2011
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 07/25/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sevilla, Santiago. Filed By: Sevilla, Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 07/25/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • Court Judgment rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • Case located in Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • Court Judgment was rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • The default was denied as to Lewis, Arthur; Le-Compte, Kiwi on Complaint filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn. Refers to: Le-Compte, Kiwi; Lewis, Arthur Filed By: Sevilla, Santiago (Plaintiff); Sevilla, Kathryn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sevilla, Kathryn. Refers to: Le-Compte, Kiwi Filed By: Sevilla, Kathryn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 12/09/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2009
  • Default entered as to Fresh Start Financial Solutions on Complaint filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • Statement of Damages filed by Sevilla, Kathryn; Sevilla, Santiago. Filed By: Sevilla, Kathryn (Plaintiff); Sevilla, Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • Certificate of Service filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn. Refers to: Fresh Start Financial Solutions Filed By: Sevilla, Santiago (Plaintiff); Sevilla, Kathryn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn. Refers to: Fresh Start Financial Solutions Filed By: Sevilla, Santiago (Plaintiff); Sevilla, Kathryn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn. Refers to: Fresh Start Financial Solutions Filed By: Sevilla, Santiago (Plaintiff); Sevilla, Kathryn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn. Refers to: Fresh Start Financial Solutions Filed By: Sevilla, Santiago (Plaintiff); Sevilla, Kathryn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • Complaint filed by Sevilla, Santiago; Sevilla, Kathryn. Refers to: Fresh Start Financial Solutions; Lewis, Arthur; Le-Compte, Kiwi Filed By: Sevilla, Santiago (Plaintiff); Sevilla, Kathryn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.