This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 08:07:29 (UTC).

Santa Cruz VS Ace Valla Inc

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Santa Cruz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ace Valla Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santa Cruz, Julie

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Ace Valla Inc; DBA : San Diego Fence Company

Cross Defendant

ST VINCENT DE PAUL CATHOLIC CHURCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kindley, George R

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ROEB, CRAIG A

Attorney at CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN & ROEB

 

Court Documents

Summons

Original Summons filed by Santa Cruz, Julie. Refers to: Ace Valla Inc

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Plaintiff Julie Santa Cruz' Complaint for Damages

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Santa Cruz, Julie. Refers to: Ace Valla Inc

Plaintiff Julie Santa Cruz' Complaint for Damages

Complaint filed by Santa Cruz, Julie. Refers to: Ace Valla Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Santa Cruz, Julie. Refers to: Ace Valla Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons (Cross complaint) filed by Ace Valla Inc.

Cross-Complaint for 1. INDEMNITY; 2.CONTRIBUTION; 3. APPORTIONMENT; AND 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF

Cross-Complaint filed by Ace Valla Inc. Refers to: ST VINCENT DE PAUL CATHOLIC CHURCH

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Ace Valla Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Ace Valla Inc.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ace Valla Inc. Filed By: Ace Valla Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Ace Valla Inc. Filed By: Ace Valla Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Ace Valla Inc. Refers to: ST VINCENT DE PAUL CATHOLIC CHURCH Filed By: Ace Valla Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (Cross complaint) filed by Ace Valla Inc. Filed By: Ace Valla Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Santa Cruz, Julie. Refers to: Ace Valla Inc Filed By: Santa Cruz, Julie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Santa Cruz, Julie. Refers to: Ace Valla Inc Filed By: Santa Cruz, Julie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Santa Cruz, Julie. Refers to: Ace Valla Inc Filed By: Santa Cruz, Julie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Santa Cruz, Julie. Refers to: Ace Valla Inc Filed By: Santa Cruz, Julie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ace Valla Inc; DBA : San Diego Fence Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINDLEY, GEORGE R.