This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/13/2018 at 06:06:09 (UTC).

Sandson vs. Daly MD

Case Summary

On 11/18/2015 Sandson filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Daly MD. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDSON, MARK

San Marcos, CA 92078

SANDSON, SUSAN

San Marcos, CA 92078

Defendants

A MEDICAL GROUP INC

DALY MD, JOSEPH TERENCE

KARTSONIS MD, LOUIS

SAN DIEGO VITREORETINAL ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sandson, Susan; Sandson, MArk. Refers to: Daly MD, Joseph; San Diego Vitreoretinal Associates; A Medical Group Inc; Kartsonis MD, Louis

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sandson, Susan; Sandson, MArk. Refers to: Daly MD, Joseph; San Diego Vitreoretinal Associates; A Medical Group Inc; Kartsonis MD, Louis

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sandson, Susan; Sandson, MArk. Refers to: Daly MD, Joseph; San Diego Vitreoretinal Associates; A Medical Group Inc; Kartsonis MD, Louis

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sandson, MArk; Sandson, Susan.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2016 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Sandson, MArk .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Sandson, Susan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Kartsonis MD, Louis .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to A Medical Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to San Diego Vitreoretinal Associates.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Daly MD, Joseph Terence .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sandson, MArk; Sandson, Susan. Filed By: Sandson, MArk (Plaintiff); Sandson, Susan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2016 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Sandson, Susan; Sandson, MArk. Refers to: Daly MD, Joseph; San Diego Vitreoretinal Associates; A Medical Group Inc; Kartsonis MD, Louis Filed By: Sandson, Susan (Plaintiff); Sandson, MArk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sandson, Susan; Sandson, MArk. Refers to: Daly MD, Joseph; San Diego Vitreoretinal Associates; A Medical Group Inc; Kartsonis MD, Louis Filed By: Sandson, Susan (Plaintiff); Sandson, MArk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Sandson, Susan; Sandson, MArk. Refers to: Daly MD, Joseph; San Diego Vitreoretinal Associates; A Medical Group Inc; Kartsonis MD, Louis Filed By: Sandson, Susan (Plaintiff); Sandson, MArk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant