This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 15:40:31 (UTC).

SANDOVAL vs Nissan North America Inc

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 SANDOVAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nissan North America Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL, MAGDA

Defendant

Nissan North America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dolin, Tionna

1888 Century Park East 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by SANDOVAL, MAGDA. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SANDOVAL, MAGDA. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by SANDOVAL, MAGDA. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by SANDOVAL, MAGDA.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by SANDOVAL, MAGDA.; Filed By: SANDOVAL, MAGDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SANDOVAL, MAGDA. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc; Filed By: SANDOVAL, MAGDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SANDOVAL, MAGDA. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc; Filed By: SANDOVAL, MAGDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by SANDOVAL, MAGDA. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc; Filed By: SANDOVAL, MAGDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA