This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/20/2019 at 01:13:37 (UTC).

Sanders vs Han DPM

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by Sanders against Han DPM in the jurisdiction of San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************M-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanders, Andrea

Defendants

North Coast Surgery Center LTD

Han DPM, James Yin

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanders, Andrea. Refers to: Han DPM, James; North Coast Surgery Center LTD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sanders, Andrea. Refers to: Han DPM, James; North Coast Surgery Center LTD

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sanders, Andrea. Refers to: Han DPM, James; North Coast Surgery Center LTD

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Sanders, Andrea.

 

Docket Entries

10/08/2019
View Court Documents

Request for Dismissal filed by Sanders, Andrea. Filed By: Sanders, Andrea (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2019

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2019

Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Sanders, Andrea .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2019

Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to North Coast Surgery Center LTD.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2019

Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Han DPM, James Yin .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019
View Court Documents

Case initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019

Case assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019

Summons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019
View Court Documents

Original Summons filed by Sanders, Andrea. Refers to: Han DPM, James; North Coast Surgery Center LTD Filed By: Sanders, Andrea (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019
View Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanders, Andrea. Refers to: Han DPM, James; North Coast Surgery Center LTD Filed By: Sanders, Andrea (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2019
View Court Documents

Complaint filed by Sanders, Andrea. Refers to: Han DPM, James; North Coast Surgery Center LTD Filed By: Sanders, Andrea (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less