This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/16/2020 at 04:58:28 (UTC).

SANDERS vs ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 SANDERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline M. Stern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jacqueline M. Stern

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDERS, KRISTINE

SANDERS, BEAUFORD

Defendants

ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; DBA : ALL ACCESS SERVICES, INC

GAMMON, JERMAINE ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kroger Diamond, Catharine E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KROGER DIAMOND & CAMPOS APC

Defendant Attorney

Obra-White, Bethsaida C

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 04/02/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 04/30/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/10/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE ANTONIO.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE ANTONIO.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE ANTONIO. Refers to: SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE ANTONIO.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE ANTONIO.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE ANTONIO.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: GAMMON, JERMAINE

Complaint

Complaint filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 04/02/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial rescheduled to 04/30/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/02/2020 at 10:00AM before Judge Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketJury demanded by all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/10/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Filed By: SANDERS, BEAUFORD (Plaintiff); SANDERS, KRISTINE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Filed By: SANDERS, BEAUFORD (Plaintiff); SANDERS, KRISTINE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC Filed By: SANDERS, BEAUFORD (Plaintiff); SANDERS, KRISTINE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: GAMMON, JERMAINE Filed By: SANDERS, BEAUFORD (Plaintiff); SANDERS, KRISTINE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE Filed By: SANDERS, BEAUFORD (Plaintiff); SANDERS, KRISTINE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE Filed By: SANDERS, BEAUFORD (Plaintiff); SANDERS, KRISTINE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SANDERS, BEAUFORD; SANDERS, KRISTINE. Refers to: ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS, INC; GAMMON, JERMAINE Filed By: SANDERS, BEAUFORD (Plaintiff); SANDERS, KRISTINE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL ACCESS EQUIPMENT RENTALS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBRA-WHITE BETHSAIDA CORREA