This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:59:00 (UTC).

Sanchez vs Legoland California LLC

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Legoland California LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez, Samantha

Defendants

Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc

Legoland California LLC

Legoland California Resort LLC; ESA : Legoland California LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peterson, Christopher L

Borja, Melissa L

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, Rosemarie S

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sanchez, Samantha. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Samantha. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sanchez, Samantha. Refers to: Legoland California LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc

Proof of Service of Summons by Personal Service (Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., A Delaware Corporation)

Proof of Service filed by Sanchez, Samantha.

Proof of Service of Summons by Personal Service (Legoland California, LLC)

Proof of Service filed by Sanchez, Samantha.

DEFENDANT LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF SAMANTHA SANCHEZ COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Legoland California LLC.

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

Answer to complaint

Answer filed by Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 11/13/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in N-28 before Earl H. Maas, III at North County.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 11/13/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in N-28 before Earl H. Maas, III at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc. Filed By: Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by Legoland California Resort LLC. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Legoland California LLC. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Sanchez, Samantha. Filed By: Sanchez, Samantha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Sanchez, Samantha. Filed By: Sanchez, Samantha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sanchez, Samantha. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc Filed By: Sanchez, Samantha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Samantha. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc Filed By: Sanchez, Samantha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sanchez, Samantha. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC; Merlin Entertainments Group US Holdings Inc Filed By: Sanchez, Samantha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases where Merlin Entertainments Group US Holding Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peterson, Christopher L