This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 01:08:19 (UTC).

Sanchez Jr vs Loews Hotels Holding Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 Sanchez Jr filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez Jr, Ramon

Defendants

Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation

Loews Hotels Holding Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neal, Todd

Union Bank Of California Building, 525 B St #2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

BANUELOS, ELSA

Attorney at BALLARD ROSENBERG GOLPER & SAVITT LLP

15760 Ventura Boulevard 18Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr. Refers to: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr. Refers to: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr. Refers to: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation

First Amended Complaint for Damages

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr. Refers to: Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation; Loews Hotels Holding Corporation

Notice of Errata to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

Notice of Errata filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr.

Answer

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed by Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation; Loews Hotels Holding Corporation.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/06/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation.; Filed By: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation (Defendant); Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr.; Filed By: Sanchez, Ramon Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to First Amended Complaint) filed by Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation; Loews Hotels Holding Corporation.; Filed By: Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation (Defendant); Loews Hotels Holding Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr. Refers to: Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation; Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Filed By: Sanchez, Ramon Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/06/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr. Refers to: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation; Filed By: Sanchez, Ramon Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr. Refers to: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation; Filed By: Sanchez, Ramon Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sanchez, Ramon Jr. Refers to: Loews Hotels Holding Corporation; Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation; Filed By: Sanchez, Ramon Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Loew's Hotels, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal, Todd