This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/24/2018 at 23:16:26 (UTC).

San Ysidro School District vs. Landmark Mechanical

Case Summary

On 01/16/2013 San Ysidro School District filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Landmark Mechanical. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CorVel Corporation

San Ysidro School District

Defendants

Landmark Mechanical

Southland Electric Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Winet, Randall L

Attorney at WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1215 W Vista Way

Vista, CA 92083-6227

Defendant Attorney

DORNY, DEBBIE

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

801 South Figueroa Street 15 Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation. Refers to: Landmark Mechanical; Southland Electric Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation. Refers to: Landmark Mechanical; Southland Electric Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation. Refers to: Landmark Mechanical; Southland Electric Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Landmark Mechanical.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/21/2013 09:45:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Denton,Steven to Wohlfeil,Joel effective 06/21/2013

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for an order continuing tiral and trial related dates) filed by San Ysidro School District.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/04/2014 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (REFERS TO: SOUTHLAND ELECTRIC only) filed by San Ysidro School District. Refers to: Southland Electric Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/24/2014 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Unconditional Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement (of Settlement) filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2014
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to CorVel Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to San Ysidro School District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Landmark Mechanical.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by San Ysidro School District. Filed By: San Ysidro School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unconditional Settlement (of Settlement) filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation. Filed By: San Ysidro School District (Plaintiff); CorVel Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/19/2014 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/03/2014 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/24/2014 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • This matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 09/19/2014 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2013
  • The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 06/21/2013 at 09:45:00 AM in C-73 before Steven R. Denton at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Landmark Mechanical. Filed By: Landmark Mechanical (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation. Filed By: San Ysidro School District (Plaintiff); CorVel Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/21/2013 at 01:45:00 PM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Denton, Steven.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation. Refers to: Landmark Mechanical; Southland Electric Inc Filed By: San Ysidro School District (Plaintiff); CorVel Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation. Refers to: Landmark Mechanical; Southland Electric Inc Filed By: San Ysidro School District (Plaintiff); CorVel Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by San Ysidro School District; CorVel Corporation. Refers to: Landmark Mechanical; Southland Electric Inc Filed By: San Ysidro School District (Plaintiff); CorVel Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Ysidro School District is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHLAND ELECTRIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CORVEL CORPORATION AS ADMINISTRATOR FOR SWEETWATER UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant