This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 03:18:37 (UTC).

SAN FUEL COMPANY LLC vs ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 SAN FUEL COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAN Fuel Committee

SAN Fuel Company LLC

Defendants

ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; DBA : ALLIED AVIATION SERVICES

ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAHMIL, ROEY

1 Maritime Plaza 18 Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Zucker II, Lawrence S

Emerald Plaza, 402 W Broadway Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by SAN Fuel Company LLC; SAN Fuel Committee. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SAN Fuel Company LLC; SAN Fuel Committee. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by SAN Fuel Company LLC; SAN Fuel Committee. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Declaration of Bethsaida C. Obra-White in Support of Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Declaration - Other (OF BETHSAIDA C. OBRA-WHITE IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION OF TIME) filed by ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC.

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Admit William R. Reed as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Proposed Order submitted by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC received but not filed on 10/19/2021.

Declaration of Applicant William R. Reed in support of Motion to Admit William R. Reed as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Declaration - Other (of Applicant William R. Reed) filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC.

Declaration of Roey Z. Rahmil in support of Motion to Admit William R. Reed as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Declaration - Other (of Roey Z. Rahmil) filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Admit William R. Reed as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Admit William R. Reed as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC.

Defendants Allied Aviation Fueling Company, Inc. dba Allied Aviation Services and Allied Aviation Holdings Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Roey Z. Rahmil) filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Applicant William R. Reed) filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC received but not filed on 10/19/2021. Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION. Filed By: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc (Defendant); ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by SAN Fuel Committee; SAN Fuel Company LLC. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION Filed By: SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by SAN Fuel Company LLC; SAN Fuel Committee. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION Filed By: SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SAN Fuel Company LLC; SAN Fuel Committee. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION Filed By: SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SAN Fuel Company LLC; SAN Fuel Committee. Refers to: ALLIED AVIATION FUELING COMPANY Inc; ALLIED AVIATION HOLDINGS CORPORATION Filed By: SAN Fuel Company LLC (Plaintiff); SAN Fuel Committee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAHMIL, ROEY Z.