This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 03:57:31 (UTC).

San Diego Police Department vs Carrillo

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 San Diego Police Department filed an Other lawsuit against Carrillo. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

San Diego Police Department

Respondent

Carrillo, Cynthia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROOKER, JEFFREY A

Attorney at SAN DIEGO CITY ATTORNEY S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/25/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Order on Request to Continue Hearing

Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by San Diego Police Department.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Order on Request to Continue Hearing

Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by San Diego Police Department.

Request to Continue Hearing for Gun Violence Restraining Order

Request to Continue Hearing for Gun Violence Restraining Order filed by San Diego Police Department.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Petition for Gun Violence Restraining Order

Petition for Gun Violence Restraining Order filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Carrillo, Cynthia

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Carrillo, Cynthia

Notice of Court Hearing

Notice of Court Hearing filed by San Diego Police Department.

Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order filed by San Diego Police Department.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-61; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 04/21/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/25/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by San Diego Police Department. Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 03/25/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by San Diego Police Department. Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Continue Hearing for Gun Violence Restraining Order filed by San Diego Police Department. Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Gun Violence Restraining Order filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Carrillo, Cynthia Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Carrillo, Cynthia Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by San Diego Police Department. Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by San Diego Police Department. Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/04/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.