This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2023 at 08:02:52 (UTC).

San Diego Gas & Electric vs. Henkels & McCoy

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 San Diego Gas Electric filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Henkels McCoy. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Defendants

Frontier California Inc.; FDBA : Verizon California, Inc.

Henkels & McCoy, Inc.

Verizon Wireless Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nourafchan, Jenus K

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Henkels & McCoy, Inc.; Frontier California Inc.; Verizon Wireless Services, LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Henkels & McCoy, Inc.; Frontier California Inc.; Verizon Wireless Services, LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Henkels & McCoy, Inc.; Frontier California Inc.; Verizon Wireless Services, LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/01/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Verizon Wireless Services, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Frontier California Inc..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Henkels & McCoy, Inc..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/01/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Henkels & McCoy, Inc.; Frontier California Inc.; Verizon Wireless Services, LLC; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Henkels & McCoy, Inc.; Frontier California Inc.; Verizon Wireless Services, LLC; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Henkels & McCoy, Inc.; Frontier California Inc.; Verizon Wireless Services, LLC; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less