This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 08:02:38 (UTC).

San Diego Gas & Electric Company vs Wright Construction Engineering Corp

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 San Diego Gas Electric Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wright Construction Engineering Corp. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Wright Construction Engineering Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Levy, Nazila

9454 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN, JOHN C

12975 Brookprinter Pl #200

Poway, CA 92064

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Wright Construction Engineering Corp

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Wright Construction Engineering Corp

Complaint

Complaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Wright Construction Engineering Corp

Answer

Answer filed by Wright Construction Engineering Corp.

Original Summons

Original Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed by Wright Construction Engineering Corp. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Wright Construction Engineering Corp. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/05/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Blaine K. Bowman at North County.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/05/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Blaine K. Bowman at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Wright Construction Engineering Corp. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Filed By: Wright Construction Engineering Corp (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed by Wright Construction Engineering Corp. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Filed By: Wright Construction Engineering Corp (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Wright Construction Engineering Corp.; Filed By: Wright Construction Engineering Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Wright Construction Engineering Corp; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Wright Construction Engineering Corp; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Wright Construction Engineering Corp; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOODMAN JOHN