This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 09:09:07 (UTC).

SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY VS TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 SAN DIEGO GAS ELECTRIC COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

Defendant

TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nourafchan, Jenus K

9454 Wilshire Boulevard 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Refers to: TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Refers to: TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

Complaint

Complaint filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Refers to: TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/09/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Refers to: TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/09/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Filed By: SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Refers to: TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC Filed By: SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketThe default filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY was entered as to TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC on Complaint . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Filed By: SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Refers to: TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC Filed By: SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Refers to: TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC Filed By: SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY. Refers to: TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC Filed By: SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less