This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 04:24:49 (UTC).

San Diego Gas & Electric Company VS TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 San Diego Gas Electric Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TL Scanlan Construction Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Portillo Concrete Inc

City of San Diego

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Portillo Concrete Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levy, Nazila

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Gregory H

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Portillo Concrete Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by City of San Diego.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by City of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/16/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (not entered) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (as to complaint only) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Cross-Complaint of Portillo Concrete, Inc.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (As to Cross-Complaint filed by Portillo Concrete Inc Only) filed by Portillo Concrete Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/23/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by City of San Diego.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: City of San Diego

Defendant City of San Diego's Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by City of San Diego.

Portillo Concrete's Motion to Set Aside Default

Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Portillo Concrete Inc.

Declaration of Gregory H. Smith in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default

Declaration - Other (of Gregory H Smith in support of motion to set aside default) filed by Portillo Concrete Inc.

Declaration of Mario Portillo in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default

Declaration - Other (of Mario Portillo in support of motion to set aside default) filed by Portillo Concrete Inc.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Portillo Concrete Inc received but not filed on 11/17/2020.

Answer

Answer filed by Portillo Concrete Inc. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Portillo Concrete Inc. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/23/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (As to Cross-Complaint filed by Portillo Concrete Inc Only) filed by Portillo Concrete Inc. Filed By: Portillo Concrete Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Portillo Concrete Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to TL Scanlan Construction Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to City of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Portillo Concrete Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to TL Scanlan Construction Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (as to complaint only) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketThe default filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company was entered as to Portillo Concrete Inc; TL Scanlan Construction Inc on Complaint . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Portillo Concrete Inc; City of San Diego Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Portillo Concrete Inc; City of San Diego Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Portillo Concrete Inc; City of San Diego Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less