This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/14/2023 at 08:54:27 (UTC).

San Diego Gas & Electric Company vs Mikha Builders LLC

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 San Diego Gas Electric Company filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Mikha Builders LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Defendants

Mikha Builders LLC

Mikha, Ryan

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS

San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAELIN, GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan

Notice of Deposit of Funds

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan

Declaration of William Anderson regarding Property

Declaration - Other (DECLARATION OF WILLIAM B ANDERSON MAI SRA RE APPRAISAL OF PROPERTY) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Notice of Deposit of Funds

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Declaration of William Anderson regarding Property

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

Amended Notice of Deposit of Funds [Code of Civil Procedure 1255.010 and 1255.020]

Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Deposit of Funds [Code of Civil Procedure 1255.010 and 1255.020]) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Ex Parte

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Amended Notice of Deposit of Funds [Code of Civil Procedure 1255.010 and 1255.020]) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 9]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 9]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (DECLARATION OF WILLIAM B ANDERSON MAI SRA RE APPRAISAL OF PROPERTY) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Mikha Builders LLC; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc MERS; San Diego County Tresurer-Tax Collector; Mikha, Ryan; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less