Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/17/2020 at 09:07:55 (UTC).

San Diego Gas & Electric Company vs. Ky To Dam

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 San Diego Gas Electric Company filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Ky To Dam. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Defendants

Dam, Ky To

JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

City of San Diego

California Reconveyance Company

Trieu, Nu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaelin III, George H

Attorney at ALLEN SEMELSBERGER & KAELIN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Phillips, Frederick C

Syz, Benjamin P

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/23/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 10/16/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

General Denial

General Denial filed by Dam, Ky To; Trieu, Nu.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Dam, Ky To; Trieu, Nu.

Defendant City of San Diego's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Eminent Domain

Answer filed by City of San Diego.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Ku To Dam

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dam, Ky

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Nu Trieu

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Trieu, Nu

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - City of San Diego

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: City of San Diego

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - California Reconveyance

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: California Reconveyance Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - JPMorgan Chase

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Deposit of Funds) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

Complaint

Complaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dam, Ky; City of San Diego; California Reconveyance Company; JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dam, Ky; City of San Diego; California Reconveyance Company; JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dam, Ky; City of San Diego; California Reconveyance Company; JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/23/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by Dam, Ky To; Trieu, Nu. Filed By: Dam, Ky To (Defendant); Trieu, Nu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Dam, Ky To; Trieu, Nu. Filed By: Dam, Ky To (Defendant); Trieu, Nu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 10/16/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dam, Ky Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Trieu, Nu Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: City of San Diego Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: California Reconveyance Company Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dam, Ky; City of San Diego; California Reconveyance Company; JP Morgan Chase Bank NA; Trieu, Nu Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dam, Ky; City of San Diego; California Reconveyance Company; JP Morgan Chase Bank NA Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Dam, Ky; City of San Diego; California Reconveyance Company; JP Morgan Chase Bank NA Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/12/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Deposit of Funds) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where California Reconveyance Company Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAELIN, GEORGE H III