This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/11/2023 at 08:04:20 (UTC).

San Diego Gas & Electric Company vs HP Communications Inc

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 San Diego Gas Electric Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HP Communications Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Defendants

Does 1 through 50

Frontier California Inc; FDBA : Verizon California Inc

Hp Communications Inc

Utiliquest LLC

Verizon Wireless Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY, NAZILA Y

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Hp Communications Inc; Frontier California Inc; Utiliquest LLC; Verizon Wireless Services LLC; Does 1 through 50

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Hp Communications Inc; Frontier California Inc; Utiliquest LLC; Verizon Wireless Services LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Hp Communications Inc; Frontier California Inc; Utiliquest LLC; Verizon Wireless Services LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Hp Communications Inc; Frontier California Inc; Utiliquest LLC; Verizon Wireless Services LLC; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Hp Communications Inc; Frontier California Inc; Utiliquest LLC; Verizon Wireless Services LLC; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Hp Communications Inc; Frontier California Inc; Utiliquest LLC; Verizon Wireless Services LLC; Does 1 through 50; Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less