This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2018 at 00:04:05 (UTC).

San Diego Gas & Electric Company vs. Cass Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 08/03/2012 San Diego Gas Electric Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cass Construction Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-EC

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Defendant

Cass Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pollick, Mark

Attorney at MARK POLLICK APC

3525 Del Mar Heights Road 769

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant Attorney

SKANE, ELIZABETH A

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

1230 Columbia Street 800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Cass Construction Inc.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Wohlfeil,Joel to Sturgeon,Eddie effective 11/16/2012

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2013 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement (and Proof of Service) filed by Cass Construction Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/05/2013 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cass Construction Inc.

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by GLASS, DOUGLAS A. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Cass Construction Inc

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2013
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/22/2013 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to San Diego Gas & Electric Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Cass Construction Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by GLASS, DOUGLAS A. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Cass Construction Inc Filed By: GLASS, DOUGLAS A (Mediator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cass Construction Inc. Filed By: Cass Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/05/2013 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Cass Construction Inc. Filed By: Cass Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company. Refers to: Cass Construction Inc Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less