This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 09:48:01 (UTC).

San Diego Association of Governments vs. Toma

Case Summary

On 04/08/2014 San Diego Association of Governments filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Toma. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************I-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Diego Association of Governments

Defendants

All persons unknown claiming any title or interest in or to the property described herein

Johanna Elvira Maloney and Mary Louise O-Brien Co-Trustees or Their Named Successor Trustees of that

Romeo's Car Wash

Toma, Michael Awdeesh

Vista Land Company

County of San Diego

San Diego County Treasurer-Tax Collector

Vista Irrigation District

SACO, MIKE

JOHANNA ELVIRA MALONEY AND MARY LOUISE O-BRIEN CO-TRUSTEES OR THEIR NAMED SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES OF THAT CERTAIN REVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT EXECUTED DECEMBER 5 1995 AND AMENDED JULY 28 2008 BY EDGAR DONALD MALONEY AND JOHANNA ELVIRA MALONEY FOR THE BENEFI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kuhn, Bradford B.

18101 Von Karman Ave #1800

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorneys

MCDONOUGH, JUDITH A.

1600 Pacific Highway Rm 355

San Diego, CA 92101

KUPERBERG, JOEL D

Attorney at RUTAN & TUCKER LLP

611 Anton Blvd 14Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by San Diego Association of Governments.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2014 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (naming Doe 1) filed by San Diego Association of Governments. Refers to: Vista Irrigation District

Answer

Answer filed by County of San Diego.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (County of San Diego Answer) filed by County of San Diego.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Vista Land Company) filed by San Diego Association of Governments. Refers to: Vista Land Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by San Diego Association of Governments. Refers to: Toma, Michael

Answer

Answer filed by Vista Irrigation District. Refers to: San Diego Association of Governments

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Vista Irrigation District [Doe 1]) filed by San Diego Association of Governments. Refers to: Vista Irrigation District

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Mary Louise O-Brien, Co-Trustee) filed by San Diego Association of Governments. Refers to: Johanna Elvira Maloney and Mary Louise O-Brien Co-Trustees or Their Named Successor Trustees of that Certain Revocable Trust Agreement Executed December 5 1995 and Amended July 28 2008 by Edgar Donald Maloney and Johanna Elvira Maloney for the Benefi

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Johanna Elvira Maloney, Co-Trustee) filed by San Diego Association of Governments. Refers to: Johanna Elvira Maloney and Mary Louise O-Brien Co-Trustees or Their Named Successor Trustees of that Certain Revocable Trust Agreement Executed December 5 1995 and Amended July 28 2008 by Edgar Donald Maloney and Johanna Elvira Maloney for the Benefi

Reply

Reply (in Support of Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession) filed by San Diego Association of Governments.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/22/2014 01:30:00 PM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Vista Irrigation District.

Disclaimer

Disclaimer filed by San Diego County Treasurer-Tax Collector; County of San Diego.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by San Diego Association of Governments.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action filed by San Diego Association of Governments. Filed By: San Diego Association of Governments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/04/2015 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2015 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to San Diego Association of Governments.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Vista Irrigation District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Toma, Michael Awdeesh .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to San Diego County Treasurer-Tax Collector.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to SACO, MIKE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Romeo's Car Wash.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Johanna Elvira Maloney and Mary Louise O-Brien Co-Trustees or Their Named Successor Trustees of that Certain Revocable Trust Agreement Executed December 5 1995 and Amended July 28 2008 by Edgar Donald Maloney and Johanna Elvira Maloney for the Benefi.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion - Other (Order for Prejudgment Possession) filed by San Diego Association of Governments. Filed By: San Diego Association of Governments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/22/2014 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2014 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Diego Association of Governments.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by San Diego Association of Governments.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by San Diego Association of Governments.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.