This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 05:13:10 (UTC).

Sampier vs. Trader Joe's

Case Summary

On 05/03/2012 Sampier filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Trader Joe's. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-EC

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sampier, Dixie

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Rainbow Investment Company

Trader Joe's

TRADER JOE'S COMPANY; AKA : TRADER JOE'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Savaglio, Barbara B

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BARBARA B SAVAGLIO

Camino Del Rio S

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

VRANJES, MARK

Attorney at GRIMM VRANJES & GREER LLP

550 W C Street 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

HARBER, STEPHEN M

Attorney at MCCUNE & HARBER LLP

1150 S Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90015

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company; Rainbow Investment Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company; Rainbow Investment Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Rainbow Investment Company

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Sampier, Dixie.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Rainbow Investment Company.

Answer

Answer filed by Trader Joe's Company. Refers to: Sampier, Dixie

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Rainbow Investment Company. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company; Sampier, Dixie

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sampier, Dixie.

Answer

Answer filed by Trader Joe's Company. Refers to: Rainbow Investment Company

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Rainbow Investment Company.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Trader Joe's Company.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/16/2012 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Answer

Answer filed by Rainbow Investment Company. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement filed by JOSEPH, JEFFREY.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC. ON 10-09-2012) submitted by Trader Joe's Company rejected on 09/04/2013.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINBOW INVESTMENT COMPANY ON 06-15-2012) filed by Rainbow Investment Company.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Sampier, Dixie .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rainbow Investment Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Trader Joe's Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sampier, Dixie. Filed By: Sampier, Dixie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rainbow Investment Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Trader Joe's Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINBOW INVESTMENT COMPANY ON 06-15-2012) filed by Rainbow Investment Company. Filed By: Rainbow Investment Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Trader Joe's Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rainbow Investment Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC., ON 10-22-2012) filed by Trader Joe's Company. Filed By: Trader Joe's Company (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Sampier, Dixie. Filed By: Sampier, Dixie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Rainbow Investment Company Filed By: Sampier, Dixie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company Filed By: Sampier, Dixie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Damages filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company; Rainbow Investment Company Filed By: Sampier, Dixie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company; Rainbow Investment Company Filed By: Sampier, Dixie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company; Rainbow Investment Company Filed By: Sampier, Dixie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Sampier, Dixie. Refers to: Trader Joe's Company; Rainbow Investment Company Filed By: Sampier, Dixie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.