This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 08:05:34 (UTC).

Saludes vs Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 Saludes filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saludes, Silvia

Defendants

Target Corporation

Target General Merchandise Inc

Target Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

De Santis, Thomas J

Ryan, Valorie E

Defendant Attorneys

Schroeder, Tommy U

Schulz, Peter J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of eService

Proof of Service filed by Target Corporation.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Target Corporation.

Proof of Service by Mail

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 22]

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Target Corporation.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Target Corporation.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Bacal, Katherine to Carolyn Caietti effective 11/22/2022

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Saludes, Silvia. Refers to: Target Stores Inc; Target General Merchandise Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Saludes, Silvia. Refers to: Target General Merchandise Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Saludes, Silvia. Refers to: Target Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Saludes, Silvia.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint (Case Initiation)

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

[Another document for ROA# 7]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Target Corporation.; Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Target Corporation.; Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 22]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.; Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Bacal, Katherine to Carolyn Caietti effective 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Target Corporation.; Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Saludes, Silvia.; Filed By: Saludes, Silvia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Saludes, Silvia. Refers to: Target Corporation; Target General Merchandise Inc; Target Stores Inc; Filed By: Saludes, Silvia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Saludes, Silvia. Refers to: Target Corporation; Target General Merchandise Inc; Target Stores Inc; Filed By: Saludes, Silvia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less