This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 07:01:47 (UTC).

Saldana v. Camacho

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Saldana filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Camacho. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Maldonado Saldana, Maria

Escondido, CA 92025

Respondent

Camacho, Alma

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned from N-03 to N-26 effective 12/31/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/21/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Maldonado Saldana, Maria. Refers to: Camacho, Alma; Filed By: Maldonado Saldana, Maria (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Other (Stipulation for Court Commissioner) filed by Maldonado Saldana, Maria.; Filed By: Maldonado Saldana, Maria (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Maldonado Saldana, Maria. Refers to: Camacho, Alma; Filed By: Maldonado Saldana, Maria (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (GRANTED) filed by Maldonado Saldana, Maria. Refers to: Camacho, Alma; Filed By: Maldonado Saldana, Maria (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Maldonado Saldana, Maria. Refers to: Camacho, Alma; Filed By: Maldonado Saldana, Maria (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Maldonado Saldana, Maria. Refers to: Camacho, Alma; Filed By: Maldonado Saldana, Maria (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less