This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/07/2023 at 08:07:01 (UTC).

Salazar vs Qualcomm Inc

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Salazar filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Qualcomm Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salazar, Cathy

Defendants

Garcia, Olivia

Qualcomm Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cantor, Zachary

1112 Montana Ave Suite C

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Braddock, Joshua C

1245 Island Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Michalowski, Jeffrey

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Salazar, Cathy. Refers to: Qualcomm Inc; Garcia, Olivia

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Complaint

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Salazar, Cathy.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Garcia, Olivia; Qualcomm Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Garcia, Olivia; Qualcomm Inc.; Filed By: Garcia, Olivia (Defendant); Qualcomm Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Salazar, Cathy.; Filed By: Salazar, Cathy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 5]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Salazar, Cathy. Refers to: Qualcomm Inc; Garcia, Olivia; Filed By: Salazar, Cathy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less