This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 07:26:15 (UTC).

Sainani vs Legoland California LLC

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Sainani filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Legoland California LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy M. Casserly and Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy M. Casserly

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sainani, Sameer

Defendant

Legoland of California LLC; DBA : Legoland California Resort

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Sainani, Sameer. Refers to: Legoland of California LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sainani, Sameer. Refers to: Legoland of California LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Complaint

Complaint filed by Sainani, Sameer. Refers to: Legoland of California LLC

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sainani, Sameer. Refers to: Legoland of California LLC

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (Granted to 9/17/21) filed by Sainani, Sameer.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 09/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sainani, Sameer. Refers to: Legoland of California LLC Filed By: Sainani, Sameer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Legoland of California LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Sainani, Sameer .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Bowman, Blaine for 09/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 09/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (Granted to 9/17/21) filed by Sainani, Sameer. Filed By: Sainani, Sameer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sainani, Sameer. Refers to: Legoland of California LLC Filed By: Sainani, Sameer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sainani, Sameer. Refers to: Legoland of California LLC Filed By: Sainani, Sameer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Sainani, Sameer. Refers to: Legoland of California LLC Filed By: Sainani, Sameer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant