This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 03:14:02 (UTC).

S & J Supply Company, Inc vs. Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 S J Supply Company, Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S & J SUPPLY COMPANY, INC

Defendants

SOCAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC

PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS, LLC

JEFFREY HUBERMAN AND REBECCA HUBERMAN, AS TRUSTEES OF THE HUBERMAN FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 21, 2013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURRAY, LAUREN B

Attorney at LANAK & HANNA P C

625 S The City Drive 190

Orange, CA 92868

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Notice - Other (Withdrawal of Notice of Pending Action) submitted by S & J Supply Company, Inc rejected on 07/19/2017.

Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action

Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc.

Complaint for Foreclosure of Mechanics' Lien

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC; Socal Industrial Partners, LLC; Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC; Socal Industrial Partners, LLC; Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013

Certificate of Assignment

Statement of Venue filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC; Socal Industrial Partners, LLC; Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC; Socal Industrial Partners, LLC; Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Socal Industrial Partners, LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Withdrawal of Notice of Pending Action) submitted by S & J Supply Company, Inc rejected on 07/19/2017. Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to S & J Supply Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Socal Industrial Partners, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Socal Industrial Partners, LLC Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC; Socal Industrial Partners, LLC; Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013 Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC; Socal Industrial Partners, LLC; Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013 Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC; Socal Industrial Partners, LLC; Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013 Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by S & J Supply Company, Inc. Refers to: Pacific Industrial Partners, LLC; Socal Industrial Partners, LLC; Jeffrey Huberman and Rebecca Huberman, as Trustees of the Huberman Family Trust dated February 21, 2013 Filed By: S & J Supply Company, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where S&J SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEC LAUREN B.