This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 08:09:24 (UTC).

Ryan D Eberle vs. Aztec Lofts LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Ryan D Eberle filed an Other lawsuit against Aztec Lofts LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eberle, Ryan D

San Diego, CA 92115

Defendants

ALS Calico Corporation; DBA : Aztec Lofts LP

Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A

Aztec Lofts LLC

Bedo, Szandra

Cassidy & Associates Real Estate Inc

Cassidy, Timothy

Crandall, Nick

Diamond Solid Waste Services Inc; DBA : Diamond Environmental Services LP

Dubon, Janelle

EAN Services LLC

Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles LLC

Le, Thao

Marilynn Morton Trustee of Thomas and Marilynn Morton Family Trust

Miller, Jeff

Monte Development LLC

Morton, Marilynn

Morton, Thomas

Next Space Development Realty Inc

PBS Construction Services Inc

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Farmer, John T

Oberrecht, Kimberly S

101 W Broadway #600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Meet and Confer

Declaration of Meet and Confer (of Nathaniel J Michels RE: Unable to Meet and Confer) filed by St Pierre, Erica; Dubon, Janelle; Miller, Jeff; Crandall, Nick; Pacific Living Properties Inc; Bedo, Szandra; Le, Thao; Torrey Pines Property Management Inc; Aztecs Lofts LP.

Proposed Order Granting Defendant Anifowosh's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

Proposed Order submitted by Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A received but not filed on 06/03/2022.

Declaration of Haley A. Murphy in Support of Motion of Defendant Abdulazeez A. Anifowosh to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint

Declaration - Other (of Haley A. Murphy) filed by Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Anifowosh's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A.

Defendant Abdulazeez Anifowosh's Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

Motion to Strike (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (of amended complaint/summons) filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (GRANTED) filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Declaration of Due Diligence (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Declaration - Other (of Due Diligence) filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Eberle, Ryan D. Refers to: Pacific Residential LLC

Declaration of Due Diligence (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Declaration - Other (of Due Diligence) filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Eberle, Ryan D. Refers to: Monte Development LLC

Declaration of Due Diligence (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Declaration - Other (of Due Diligence) filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Eberle, Ryan D. Refers to: Zuma West LLC

Declaration of Due Diligence (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Declaration - Other (of Due Diligence) filed by Eberle, Ryan D.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Eberle, Ryan D. Refers to: Torrey Pines Property Management Inc

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Meet and Confer (of Nathaniel J Michels RE: Unable to Meet and Confer) filed by St Pierre, Erica; Dubon, Janelle; Miller, Jeff; Crandall, Nick; Pacific Living Properties Inc; Bedo, Szandra; Le, Thao; Torrey Pines Property Management Inc; Aztecs Lofts LP.; Filed By: St Pierre, Erica (Defendant); Dubon, Janelle (Defendant); Miller, Jeff (Defendant); Crandall, Nick (Defendant); Pacific Living Properties Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A received but not filed on 06/03/2022.; Filed By: Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Haley A. Murphy) filed by Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A.; Filed By: Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A.; Filed By: Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A.; Filed By: Anifowosh, Abdulazeez A (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 9]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 9]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Eberle, Ryan D.; Filed By: Eberle, Ryan D (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Eberle, Ryan D.; Filed By: Eberle, Ryan D (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process filed by Eberle, Ryan D. Refers to: Aztec Lofts LLC; ALS Calico Corporation; Pacific Living Properties Inc; Torrey Pines Property Management Inc; Cassidy & Associates Real Estate Inc; PBS Zuma LLC; Zuma West LLC; Pacific Residential LLC; Monte Development LLC; Next Space Development Realty Inc; Diamond Solid Waste Services Inc; PBS Construction Services Inc; State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; EAN Services LLC; St Pierre, Erica; Bedo, Szandra; Dubon, Janelle; Miller, Jeff; Crandall, Nick; Le, Thao; Morton, Thomas; Morton, Marilynn; Cassidy, Timothy; Anifowosh, Abdulazeez; Filed By: Eberle, Ryan D (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Eberle, Ryan D. Refers to: Aztec Lofts LLC; ALS Calico Corporation; Pacific Living Properties Inc; Torrey Pines Property Management Inc; Cassidy & Associates Real Estate Inc; PBS Zuma LLC; Zuma West LLC; Pacific Residential LLC; Monte Development LLC; Next Space Development Realty Inc; Diamond Solid Waste Services Inc; PBS Construction Services Inc; State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; EAN Services LLC; St Pierre, Erica; Bedo, Szandra; Dubon, Janelle; Miller, Jeff; Crandall, Nick; Le, Thao; Morton, Thomas; Morton, Marilynn; Cassidy, Timothy; Anifowosh, Abdulazeez; Filed By: Eberle, Ryan D (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Eberle, Ryan D. Refers to: Aztec Lofts LLC; ALS Calico Corporation; Pacific Living Properties Inc; Torrey Pines Property Management Inc; Cassidy & Associates Real Estate Inc; PBS Zuma LLC; Zuma West LLC; Pacific Residential LLC; Monte Development LLC; Next Space Development Realty Inc; Diamond Solid Waste Services Inc; PBS Construction Services Inc; State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; EAN Services LLC; St Pierre, Erica; Bedo, Szandra; Dubon, Janelle; Miller, Jeff; Crandall, Nick; Le, Thao; Morton, Thomas; Morton, Marilynn; Cassidy, Timothy; Anifowosh, Abdulazeez; Thomas Morton Trustee of Thomas and Marilynn Morton Family Trust; Marilynn Morton Trustee of Thomas and Marilynn Morton Family Trust; Filed By: Eberle, Ryan D (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DIAMOND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE