Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 07:32:03 (UTC).

RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC vs Dove

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Dove. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC; DBA : Westwind Mobile Lodge

Respondent

Dove, Cheryl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEAM, GREGORY B

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 03/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing (Granting Petition for Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Civil Code 798.88; Injunction) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 02/26/2021 02:30:00 PM.

Notice of Continued Hearing on Petition for Permanent Injunction

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF CONTUNUED HEARING) filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 02/19/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing (Amended 2/26/21) filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (2/26/21) submitted by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC received but not filed on 02/23/2021.

Petition for Permanent Injunction

Petition - Other filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC. Refers to: Dove, Cheryl

Declaration of Gregory B. Beam in Support of Petition for Permanent Injunction

Declaration - Other filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC. Refers to: Dove, Cheryl

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Declaration of Gregory B. Beam in Support of Petition for Permanent Injunction

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Petition for Permanent Injunction

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Declaration of Michelle Ramirez in Support of Petition for Permanent Injunction

Declaration - Other filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC. Filed By: RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing (Granting Petition for Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Civil Code 798.88; Injunction) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 03/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase reclassified from Civil - Unlimited to Civil - Limited on 03/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition continued pursuant to Court's motion to 03/16/2021 at 09:00AM before Judge Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 02/26/2021 02:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE OF CONTUNUED HEARING) filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC. Filed By: RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Hearing on Petition published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC. Refers to: Dove, Cheryl Filed By: RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC. Refers to: Dove, Cheryl Filed By: RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC. Refers to: Dove, Cheryl Filed By: RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC. Refers to: Dove, Cheryl Filed By: RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RW Commercial Property Holdings LLC; DBA : Westwind Mobile Lodge is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEAM GREGORY BRUCE