This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/01/2016 at 12:12:30 (UTC).

Rudolph Vs. Surfaces Usa

Case Summary

On 07/06/2012 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Rudolph against Surfaces Usa in the jurisdiction of San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Randa Trapp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rudolph, Scott

Defendants

M S International Inc

Surfaces Usa

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: Surfaces USA; M S International Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: Surfaces USA; M S International Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: Surfaces USA; M S International Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: M S International Inc

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rudolph, Scott.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service (Surfaces USA) filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: Surfaces USA

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Service (Surfaces USA) filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: Surfaces USA Filed By: Rudolph, Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rudolph, Scott. Filed By: Rudolph, Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: M S International Inc Filed By: Rudolph, Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: Surfaces USA; M S International Inc Filed By: Rudolph, Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: Surfaces USA; M S International Inc Filed By: Rudolph, Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Rudolph, Scott. Refers to: Surfaces USA; M S International Inc Filed By: Rudolph, Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less