This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2022 at 12:58:57 (UTC).

Ruby Rules LLC vs No Frill Franchising Inc

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Ruby Rules LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against No Frill Franchising Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald L. Styn and Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ronald L. Styn

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruby Rules LLC

Defendants

Biz Up Inc

Askar, Ralph

No Frill Franchising Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIOTT, CHRISTOPHER R

4 Hutton Centre Dr Suite 900

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Defendant Attorney

Welch, Eric M

Attorney at THE WELCH LAW GROUP

110 West C Street Suite 2101

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial & Set OSC

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to Continue Trial) filed by Ruby Rules LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/19/2022 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Ruby Rules LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Ruby Rules LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/09/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Set Aside Default/Allow Answer and Order Signed 11/6/20) filed by Biz Up Inc; No Frill Franchising Inc; Askar, Ralph.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

[Another document for ROA# 17]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: Biz Up Inc

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: No Frill Franchising Inc

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: Askar, Ralph

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute-Askar

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: Askar, Ralph

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute Biz Up

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: Biz Up Inc

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/19/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/24/2023 at 01:30PM before Judge Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial continued pursuant to party's motion to 03/10/2023 at 01:30PM before Judge Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to Continue Trial) filed by Ruby Rules LLC.; Filed By: Ruby Rules LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 01/19/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: No Frill Franchising Inc; Filed By: Ruby Rules LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: Biz Up Inc; Filed By: Ruby Rules LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: Askar, Ralph; Filed By: Ruby Rules LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: No Frill Franchising Inc; Biz Up Inc; Askar, Ralph; Filed By: Ruby Rules LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: No Frill Franchising Inc; Biz Up Inc; Askar, Ralph; Filed By: Ruby Rules LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ruby Rules LLC. Refers to: No Frill Franchising Inc; Biz Up Inc; Askar, Ralph; Filed By: Ruby Rules LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIOTT CHRISTOPHER R.