This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 08:05:27 (UTC).

Rubio vs The Golden 1 Credit Union

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Rubio filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against The Golden 1 Credit Union. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rubio, Jaqueline

Defendants

PAR Inc

The Golden 1 Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cardona Loya II, Octavio

Attorney at GOLDEN & CARDONA LOYA LLP

3130 Bonita Rd #200B

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorney

Fleener, Janlynn R

Attorney at DOWNEY BRAND LLP

621 Capitol Mall 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: The Golden 1 Credit Union; PAR Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: The Golden 1 Credit Union; PAR Inc

Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: The Golden 1 Credit Union; PAR Inc

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: The Golden 1 Credit Union

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: PAR Inc

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by The Golden 1 Credit Union; PAR Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by The Golden 1 Credit Union; PAR Inc.; Filed By: The Golden 1 Credit Union (Defendant); PAR Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: PAR Inc; Filed By: Rubio, Jaqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: The Golden 1 Credit Union; Filed By: Rubio, Jaqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: The Golden 1 Credit Union; PAR Inc; Filed By: Rubio, Jaqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: The Golden 1 Credit Union; PAR Inc; Filed By: Rubio, Jaqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rubio, Jaqueline. Refers to: The Golden 1 Credit Union; PAR Inc; Filed By: Rubio, Jaqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Par Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cardona Loya II, Octavio