This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/28/2020 at 16:06:26 (UTC).

RSF Associates LLC vs Nieto

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 RSF Associates LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nieto. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONALD F. FRAZIER and ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

RONALD F. FRAZIER

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Respondents

RSF ASSOCIATES LLC

GRANDPOINT BANK

INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Appellants

NIETO, NATHANIEL JOSEPH; DBA : DAVE HEYDEN LANDSCAPE

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MOONEY, STEPHEN J

2740 Camino Capistrano

San Clemente, CA 92672

QUINN, DARREN J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DARREN J QUINN

12702 Via Cortina #105

Del Mar, CA 92014

AUGUST, MARSHALL J

1000 Wilshire Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

HOPKINS, RONALD W

9696 Culver Boulevard 302

Culver City, CA 90232

FREEDMAN, EDWARD W

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD W FREEDMAN

4540 Kearny Villa Road 209

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment issued

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Notice of Clearing Default

Notice of Clearing Default filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal

Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Notice of Default

Notice of Default filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Reply Declaration Of Darren J. Quinn In Support of Attorney Fees

Declaration - Other filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/23/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 09/06/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Entry of Orders

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Notice of Clearing Default SD

Notice of Clearing Default SD generated.

Notice of Reporter's Waiver

Notice of Reporter's Waiver (Kim Ross) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice RE: Fee for Record on Appeal

Notice RE: Fee for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Proposed Amended Judgment After Trial

Proposed Order filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Attachment - Amended Judgment PDF Version

Judgment (AMENDED JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL) filed by RSF Associates LLC.

Attachment - Amended Judgment PDF Version

[Another document for ROA# 186]

116 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt for Record on Appeal (from DCA) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisbursement of Clerk's Trust Fund filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Reporter's Transcript (Kim Ross) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 186]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 186]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by RSF Associates LLC. Filed By: RSF Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Nieto, Nathaniel Joseph.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Nieto, Nathaniel Joseph.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nieto, Nathaniel Joseph.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by RSF Associates LLC. Refers to: Nieto, Nathaniel; Hudson Insurance Company Filed By: RSF Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by RSF Associates LLC. Refers to: Nieto, Nathaniel; Hudson Insurance Company Filed By: RSF Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by RSF Associates LLC. Refers to: Nieto, Nathaniel; Hudson Insurance Company Filed By: RSF Associates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANDPOINT BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREEDMAN EDWARD W.