This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 02:50:43 (UTC).

RQ Construction LLC vs URS Group INC

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 RQ Construction LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against URS Group INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RQ Construction LLC

Defendant

URS Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Sara E

Attorney at MARKS GOLIA & PINTO LLP

Defendant Attorney

Kosmo, Frederick W Jr

Attorney at WILSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by RQ Construction LLC. Refers to: URS Group Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by RQ Construction LLC. Refers to: URS Group Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by RQ Construction LLC. Refers to: URS Group Inc

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by URS Group Inc.

Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint

Order - Other (Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint (ORDER SIGNED 1-23-20) filed by URS Group Inc.

Stipulation - Other - Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) filed by URS Group Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (of demurrer, memorandum of points and authorities, proposed order) filed by URS Group Inc.

Proposed Order Granting Defendant URS Group, Inc.'s Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Stay

Proposed Order (granting demurrer to plaintiffs complaint) submitted by URS Group Inc received but not filed on 02/14/2020.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendant URS Group, Inc.'s Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Stay

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of demurrer to plaintiffs complaint) filed by URS Group Inc.

Notice of Demurrer and Motion to Stay

Demurrer filed by URS Group Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/05/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for an Order Granting the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Stay Action) filed by URS Group Inc; RQ Construction LLC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/05/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for an Order Granting the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Stay Action) filed by URS Group Inc; RQ Construction LLC. Filed By: URS Group Inc (Defendant); RQ Construction LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed by URS Group Inc. Filed By: URS Group Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of demurrer to plaintiffs complaint) filed by URS Group Inc. Filed By: URS Group Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint (ORDER SIGNED 1-23-20) filed by URS Group Inc. Filed By: URS Group Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) filed by URS Group Inc. Filed By: URS Group Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by URS Group Inc. Filed By: URS Group Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by RQ Construction LLC. Refers to: URS Group Inc Filed By: RQ Construction LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by RQ Construction LLC. Refers to: URS Group Inc Filed By: RQ Construction LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by RQ Construction LLC. Refers to: URS Group Inc Filed By: RQ Construction LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URS GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RQ Construction, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kosmo, Frederick W Jr