Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 04:16:25 (UTC).

Rothrock vs Cowboys Roofing Inc

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 Rothrock filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cowboys Roofing Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rothrock, Nicole

Defendants

Weiss, Cynthia

Cowboy's Roofing Inc; DBA : Cowboy's Construction, a CA corporation

Weiss, Harry A

Cowboy's Roofing Inc; DBA : Cowboy's Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor, Steven L

Attorney at STEVEN L VICTOR ATTORNEY AT LAW APC

Defendant Attorneys

Barr, Joseph

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH BARR & ASSOCIATES

Lawless, Kevin E

Ebner, Darren M

 

Court Documents

Cowboy Roofing Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

Motion to Strike (portions of plaintiffs complaint) filed by Cowboy's Roofing Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry A.

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry A.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rothrock, Nicole.

Cowboy's Roofing Inc.'s Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cowboy's Roofing Inc.

Opposition to Cowboy's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in opposition to motion to strike) filed by Rothrock, Nicole.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (memorandum) filed by Rothrock, Nicole.

Cowboy's Reply iso Demurrer

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Cowboy's Roofing Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/05/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Cowboy's Roofing Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Weiss, Cynthia

Complaint for Damages

Complaint filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Cowboy's Roofing Inc; Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Cowboy's Roofing Inc; Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Cowboy's Roofing Inc; Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order Signed 2/23/21) filed by Cowboy's Roofing Inc; Rothrock, Nicole. Filed By: Cowboy's Roofing Inc (Defendant); Rothrock, Nicole (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 12 months.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 09:00AM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 08:45AM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/05/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry A. Filed By: Weiss, Cynthia (Defendant); Weiss, Harry A (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Weiss, Harry Filed By: Rothrock, Nicole (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Weiss, Cynthia Filed By: Rothrock, Nicole (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Cowboy's Roofing Inc; Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry Filed By: Rothrock, Nicole (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Cowboy's Roofing Inc; Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry Filed By: Rothrock, Nicole (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rothrock, Nicole. Refers to: Cowboy's Roofing Inc; Weiss, Cynthia; Weiss, Harry Filed By: Rothrock, Nicole (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/18/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARR, JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWLESS KEVIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EBNER DARREN