Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 20:58:39 (UTC).

Rostro VS UNIVERSAL MEMORIAL CENTERS V INC

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Rostro filed an Other lawsuit against UNIVERSAL MEMORIAL CENTERS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rostro, Rosangel

Defendants

SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA

California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC

Universal Memorial Centers V INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hewgill, Justin

Attorney at HEWGILL COBB & LOCKARD

Gilliland, Aisling Susan

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (first) filed by Rostro, Rosangel. Refers to: Universal Memorial Centers V INC; California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC; SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA

Complaint

Complaint filed by Rostro, Rosangel. Refers to: Universal Memorial Centers V INC; California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC; SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rostro, Rosangel. Refers to: Universal Memorial Centers V INC; California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC; SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rostro, Rosangel. Refers to: Universal Memorial Centers V INC; California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC; SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (first) filed by Rostro, Rosangel. Refers to: Universal Memorial Centers V INC; California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC; SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA Filed By: Rostro, Rosangel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/04/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rostro, Rosangel. Refers to: Universal Memorial Centers V INC; California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC; SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA Filed By: Rostro, Rosangel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rostro, Rosangel. Refers to: Universal Memorial Centers V INC; California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC; SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA Filed By: Rostro, Rosangel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rostro, Rosangel. Refers to: Universal Memorial Centers V INC; California Cemetery and Funeral Services LLC; SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL OF CALIFORNIA Filed By: Rostro, Rosangel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CEMETERY AND FUNERAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hewgill, Justin