This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/01/2020 at 00:43:09 (UTC).

Rosie Banuelos vs. Ingka Holding B.V. Inc

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Rosie Banuelos filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ingka Holding B. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Banuelos, Rosie

Defendants

Cashstar Inc

Ingka Holding BV Inc; DBA : Ikea

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Banuelos, Rosie. Refers to: Ingka Holding B.V. Inc; Cashstar Inc

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Banuelos, Rosie.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 11/14/2019 01:00:00 PM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 02/28/2020 01:00:00 PM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 02/28/2020 01:00:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial reset to 02/28/2020 at 01:00PM in C-63.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 11/14/2019 01:00:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Banuelos, Rosie. Refers to: Ingka Holding BV Inc; Cashstar Inc Filed By: Banuelos, Rosie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 11/14/2019 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Banuelos, Rosie. Filed By: Banuelos, Rosie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Banuelos, Rosie. Filed By: Banuelos, Rosie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less