This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:48:23 (UTC).

Romero vs. Salas

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Romero filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Salas. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Romero, Cezar

Defendants

Salas, Irma

Salas, Salvador

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De Santis, Thomas J

Defendant Attorney

Landrith, Kevin S

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DARLENE ROHR

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador.

Answer

Answer filed by Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Salvador

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Irma

Complaint

Complaint filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador. Filed By: Salas, Irma (Defendant); Salas, Salvador (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador. Filed By: Salas, Irma (Defendant); Salas, Salvador (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador. Filed By: Salas, Irma (Defendant); Salas, Salvador (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador. Filed By: Salas, Irma (Defendant); Salas, Salvador (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Salvador Filed By: Romero, Cezar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Irma Filed By: Romero, Cezar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador Filed By: Romero, Cezar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador Filed By: Romero, Cezar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Romero, Cezar. Refers to: Salas, Irma; Salas, Salvador Filed By: Romero, Cezar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.