This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/30/2021 at 08:23:11 (UTC).

Roman vs Pinales

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Roman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pinales. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sanchez, Maria Ochoa

Roman, Gerardo Valderrama

Defendant

Pinales, Gustavo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rulsky, Jerry

Attorney at RULSKY LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Roman, Gerardo Valderrama; Sanchez, Maria Ochoa. Refers to: Pinales, Gustavo

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Roman, Gerardo Valderrama; Sanchez, Maria Ochoa. Refers to: Pinales, Gustavo

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Roman, Gerardo Valderrama; Sanchez, Maria Ochoa. Refers to: Pinales, Gustavo

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Roman, Gerardo Valderrama; Sanchez, Maria Ochoa. Refers to: Pinales, Gustavo Filed By: Roman, Gerardo Valderrama (Plaintiff); Sanchez, Maria Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Roman, Gerardo Valderrama; Sanchez, Maria Ochoa. Refers to: Pinales, Gustavo Filed By: Roman, Gerardo Valderrama (Plaintiff); Sanchez, Maria Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Roman, Gerardo Valderrama; Sanchez, Maria Ochoa. Refers to: Pinales, Gustavo Filed By: Roman, Gerardo Valderrama (Plaintiff); Sanchez, Maria Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RULSKY JERRY