This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 12:44:00 (UTC).

Rogers vs Muldoon

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Rogers filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Muldoon. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rogers, Cory

Defendants

Johnson Machinery Co

Muldoon, Jason

Company, Quinn

Quinn Rental Services; ESA : Quinn Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ellis, Brian C

Defendant Attorney

KWONG, PAUL C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 06/21/2021 at 10:45:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Muldoon, Jason; Quinn Company.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Muldoon, Jason; Quinn Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rogers, Cory.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rogers, Cory.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rogers, Cory.

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rogers, Cory.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rogers, Cory.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 06/21/2021 at 10:45:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Muldoon, Jason; Quinn Company. Filed By: Muldoon, Jason (Defendant); Quinn Rental Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Muldoon, Jason; Quinn Company. Filed By: Muldoon, Jason (Defendant); Quinn Rental Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Rogers, Cory. Filed By: Rogers, Cory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Rogers, Cory. Filed By: Rogers, Cory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Rogers, Cory. Filed By: Rogers, Cory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rogers, Cory. Refers to: Muldoon, Jason; Quinn Rental Services; Johnson Machinery Co Filed By: Rogers, Cory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rogers, Cory. Filed By: Rogers, Cory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Rogers, Cory. Filed By: Rogers, Cory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON MACHINERY CO. A CALIF CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellis, Brian C